This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 14:50:01 (UTC).

MARK FORTUNAT VS YAMASHIRO, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 MARK FORTUNAT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YAMASHIRO, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3602

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORTUNAT MARK

Defendant

YAMASHIRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADEGARI MICHAEL MORDECHAI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/25/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/25/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/25/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/25/2022: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/25/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2025
  • Hearing04/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2023
  • Hearing10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff); As to: YAMASHIRO, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff); As to: YAMASHIRO, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff); As to: YAMASHIRO, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARK FORTUNAT (Plaintiff); As to: YAMASHIRO, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less