This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 11:28:45 (UTC).

MARK FLORES VS JOSE LUIS ROSALES

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 MARK FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE LUIS ROSALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3433

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES MARK

Defendant

ROSALES JOSE LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL ANTHONY B.

Defendant Attorney

CABRERA DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2024
  • Hearing11/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jose Luis Rosales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRERA DANIEL