This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 21:46:24 (UTC).

MARK FEIGIN VS GARFIELD MCCONICO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 MARK FEIGIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARFIELD MCCONICO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0779

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEIGIN MARK

Defendants

MEDINA EDER

MANZANO FRANCISCO

MCCONICO GARFIELD

ESTATE OF GARFIELD MCCONICO DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE VORE MICHAEL J.

DEVORE MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorney

PARSANJ GINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF MICHAEL J. DE VORE REGARDING THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO NAME THE ESTATE OF GARFIELD MCCONICO AS A DEFENDANT

7/28/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF MICHAEL J. DE VORE REGARDING THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO NAME THE ESTATE OF GARFIELD MCCONICO AS A DEFENDANT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/3/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

11/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

11/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE LITIGATION INVOLVING DECEDENT DEFENDANT

11/9/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE LITIGATION INVOLVING DECEDENT DEFENDANT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Hearing07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Estate of Garfield Mcconico, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Re Litigation Involving Decedent Defendant); Filed by Estate of Garfield Mcconico, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Estate of Garfield Mcconico, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Estate of Garfield Mcconico, deceased (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (OF MICHAEL J. DE VORE REGARDING THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO NAME THE ESTATE OF GARFIELD MCCONICO AS A DEFENDANT); Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARK FEIGIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE VORE MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVORE MICHAEL JOSEPH