This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 13:32:43 (UTC).

MARK EDWARD ALBARIAN VS MARLENE AWANE FLEISCHAUER

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 MARK EDWARD ALBARIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARLENE AWANE FLEISCHAUER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4074

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALBARIAN MARK EDWARD

Defendant

FLEISCHAUER MARLENE AWANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLUGOSKI JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

10/14/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

12/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Edward Albarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less