This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 00:41:15 (UTC).

MARK DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL VS VAIDEHI, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 MARK DAVIDSON, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against VAIDEHI, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6540

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIDSON AN INDIVIDUAL MARK

Defendant

VAIDEHI INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDOZA ANDY

Defendant Attorney

KAIMAN BARRY

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF.

1/3/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

11/14/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION) OF 11/14/2022

11/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION) OF 11/14/2022

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF TAKING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS OFF CALENDAR

10/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF TAKING ITS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS OFF CALENDAR

Motion to Compel - DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

9/30/2022: Motion to Compel - DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS DEPOSITION SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/4/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/31/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

3/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/22/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2025
  • Hearing02/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • Hearing08/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records, and Request for Sanctions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketReply TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT; Filed by: Vaidehi, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOpposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF. Filed by: Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT;: Name Extension: DEFENDANT VAIDEHI, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATION AND PRAYER FROM THE COMPLAINT;; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Compliance with Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Business Records, and Request for Sanctions: Name Extension: Compliance with Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Business Records, and Request for Sanctions; Exact Name: blank; As To Parties changed from Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff) to Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Vaidehi, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Vaidehi, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mark Davidson, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: Vaidehi, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAIMAN BARRY