This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2020 at 23:40:04 (UTC).

MARK CRAWFORD VS EVAN ARTHUR GORDON ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 MARK CRAWFORD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EVAN ARTHUR GORDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8561

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CRAWFORD MARK

Defendants and Respondents

GORDON EVAN ARTHUR

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HARRIS EDDIE J.

HARRIS EDDIE JAMES

Defendant Attorney

RIVERA VIVIAN ISABEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

11/7/2019: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 10/30/2019

10/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 10/30/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/4/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/4/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/6/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Demand for Jury Trial

5/17/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/17/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/17/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

SUMMONS -

3/19/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/19/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Crawford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Mark Crawford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...) of 10/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Evan Arthur Gordon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Crawford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698561    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARK CRAWFORD,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

EVAN ARTHUR GORDON, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC698561

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 30, 2019

Defendant propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 5/17/19.  To date, despite multiple attempts to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served verified responses (Plaintiff served untimely unverified responses on 8/16/19).  Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to provide verified responses, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Defendant’s motions are granted.  Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days.  CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b). 

Sanctions are mandatory.  §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c).  Defendant seeks sanctions in the amounts of $585 (form interrogatories) and $235/motion (special interrogatories and RPDs).  The Court finds all amounts reasonable and fully supported by Defense Counsel’s declaration.  The request for sanctions is granted in full. 

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and his attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through counsel of record, in the total amount of $1055, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.