This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 06:40:51 (UTC).

MARK CHANDLER VS MV TRANSPORTATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MARK CHANDLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MV TRANSPORTATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9438

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CHANDLER MARK

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 2 THROUGH 100

DIAL-A-RIDE

MV TRANSPORTATION INC.

DOE DRIVER

Guardian Ad Litem

ANDRY RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CARLSON STEVEN F. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG VANESSA K.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

5/8/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/29/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

3/21/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/6/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

2/17/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (CIVIL CODE ?21OO ET SEQ); AND, 2. VICARIOUS LIABILITY.

2/6/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (CIVIL CODE ?21OO ET SEQ); AND, 2. VICARIOUS LIABILITY.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

2/6/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MV Transportation, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Raymond Andry (Legacy Party); Mark Chandler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Raymond Andry (Legacy Party); Mark Chandler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE (CIVIL CODE 21OO ET SEQ); AND, 2. VICARIOUS LIABILITY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Chandler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9438    Hearing Date: February 25, 2021    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARK CHANDLER, ETC.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MV TRANSPORTATION, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****9438

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF A DISABLED ADULT OFF CALENDAR

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

February 25, 2021

Plaintiff, Mark Chandler (“Plaintiff”) was a disabled adult and was appearing in this action through his guardian ad litem (“GAL”), Raymond Andry. Plaintiff and Defendant, MV Transportation, Inc. (“Defendant”) agreed to settle all claims at issue in this lawsuit in December of 2017. In January of 2018, Plaintiff passed away.

The instant motion was last set to be heard on 7/18/20. Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the court continued this matter to 2/25/21, and ordered moving party, Plaintiff, to give notice of the new hearing date. (Min. Order 7/18/20.) As of 2/19/21, Plaintiff has not filed any such notice with this court. Nonetheless, the court will proceed. If Plaintiff persuades the court that the tentative ruling below should not be adopted, then the court will continue the hearing if Defendant has not been heard.

On 2/28/20, Petitioner filed this petition to approve the settlement. Defendant opposes the petition, contending Plaintiff has passed away and there is no evidence in the case concerning the status of his estate. Petitioner, in reply, argues settlements remain binding even after a minor or incompetent person passes away.

The purpose of a petition to approve a compromise on behalf of a minor or incompetent person is protection of the minor or incompetent person from his or her attorney, GAL, insurance company, and/or the defendant in the action.

If there is no minor or incompetent person remaining in the case, there is no reason to rule on any such petition. Notably, a ruling granting a petition to approve a compromise is not tantamount to a ruling enforcing a settlement, finding a settlement to be in good faith, etc. Each of these requests have statutory authority, and a noticed motion must be filed concerning any such request.

The petition is taken off calendar as moot in light of Plaintiff’s death. This ruling is without prejudice to any motions plaintiff’s estate may bring to enforce the settlement.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 25th day of February, 2021

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAL-A-RIDE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where MV TRANSPORTATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLSON STEVEN F