This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:02:49 (UTC).

MARK BORAO AND NOELLE BORAO VS. FRONTIER WINDOWS & DOORS

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 MARK BORAO AND NOELLE BORAO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRONTIER WINDOWS DOORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7975

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BORAO NOELLE

BORAO MARK

Defendants

FRONTIER WINDOWS & DOORS

BMPP CANOGA PARK INC.

Cross Defendant

BIAYANA CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HART WILLIAM R.

CACALI NEIL JONATHAN

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD

Other Attorneys

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

10/29/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Complaint

8/17/2017: Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint

10/9/2018: Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

4/10/2019: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/22/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/27/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

10/4/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Cross-Complaint

8/24/2017: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/24/2017: Answer

Summons

10/9/2018: Summons

Summons

8/17/2017: Summons

Unknown

11/14/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

12/22/2017: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

11/1/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

10/26/2018: Minute Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 3:34 PM in Department K; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Rescheduling;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Rescheduling;) of 04/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department K; Case Management Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by MARK BORAO (Plaintiff); NOELLE BORAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by MARK BORAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by MARK BORAO (Plaintiff); NOELLE BORAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department K; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2017
  • Answer; Filed by BMPP CANOGA PARK, INC. (Defendant); FRONTIER WINDOWS & DOORS (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Cross-complaint filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Answer (TO COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by BMPP CANOGA PARK, INC. (Defendant); FRONTIER WINDOWS & DOORS (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MARK BORAO (Plaintiff); NOELLE BORAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.