Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 03:50:50 (UTC).

MARK BEROOKIM VS AT & T CORP.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 MARK BEROOKIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AT T CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1293

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEROOKIM MARK

Defendant

AT & T CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMOUDIS THANOS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Berookim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Berookim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Berookim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Berookim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Berookim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMOUDIS THANOS