This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 09:00:25 (UTC).

MARK BAYLISS VS REGAL EDWARDS CINEMAS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 MARK BAYLISS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REGAL EDWARDS CINEMAS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1357

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYLISS MARK

Defendants

HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

REGAL EDWARDS CINEMAS INC.

THE COMMONS AT CALABASAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN ADAM QUINN

Defendant Attorneys

SANDERS JUSTIN

MUHAR GEORGE

DIXON ROBERT KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/6/2021: Answer

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

2/14/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/6/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Dismissal

12/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2024
  • Hearing06/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • Hearing07/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Regal Edwards Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant); The Commons at Calabasas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Regal Edwards Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Regal Edwards Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Regal Edwards Cinemas, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Commons at Calabasas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mark Bayliss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONS AT CALABASAS LLC THE is a litigant

Latest cases where HELMSMAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON BEHALF OF ADP TOTALSOURCE FL XVI INC. / GLOBAL INTEGRITY MAINTENANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIXON ROBERT K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS JUSTIN