Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:06:11 (UTC).

MARJORIE B. COHEN LIVING TRUST, DATED JUNE 7, 2001

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 MARJORIE B COHEN LIVING TRUST, DATED JUNE 7, 2001 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3105

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COHEN KATHLEEN MICHAEL

COHEN AARON KAPNER

COHEN HERMAN JASON

Respondent

COHEN BRIAN BROWN

Not Classified By Court

MARJORIE B. COHEN LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

COHEN HERMAN JASON

KAUFMAN MARTIN JAY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/12/2021: Minute Order

Citation - Citation

4/1/2021: Citation - Citation

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition- Removal - $465.00

4/1/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition- Removal - $465.00

Notice - Related Cases

4/1/2021: Notice - Related Cases

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • Hearing08/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCitation (Citation ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition- Removal - $465.00 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer H. JASON COHEN ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN MARTIN J.