This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:43:09 (UTC).

MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH VS ARBALACORP, LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ARBALACORP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7574

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHOSRAVIZADEH MARIYAN

Defendants

DOES 1-10

ARBALOV PETAR

ARBALACORP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TORABI KASRA

TORABI KASRA SEYED

Defendant Attorney

MARSHALL WAYNE STANTON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application

10/16/2018: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

10/17/2018: Opposition

Order

10/17/2018: Order

Notice of Ruling

10/18/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Lodging

10/30/2018: Notice of Lodging

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/31/2018: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

10/31/2018: Opposition

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

10/29/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Reply

10/29/2018: Reply

Request for Judicial Notice

10/11/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

10/11/2018: Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

Minute Order

10/17/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

7/27/2018: Summons

Complaint

7/27/2018: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens (& For Fees And Costs) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens (& For Fees And Costs) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens & For Fees And Cos...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Opposition (of defendants, Arbalacorp, LLC and Petar Arbalov to ex-parte application of plaintiff for temporary restraining order); Filed by ARBALACORP, LLC (Defendant); PETAR ARBALOV (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (for a Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Notice of Lodging (Of Transcript Of Plaintiff Mariyan Khosravi); Filed by ARBALACORP, LLC (Defendant); PETAR ARBALOV (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Reply (To Opposition To Motion To Expunge Lis Pendens); Filed by ARBALACORP, LLC (Defendant); PETAR ARBALOV (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2018
  • Answer; Filed by ARBALACORP, LLC (Defendant); PETAR ARBALOV (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint FOR IMPOSITION OF CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons; Filed by MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by MARIYAN KHOSRAVIZADEH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Notice PENDANCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORABI KASRA SEYED