This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 14:06:42 (UTC).

MARITZA E. OLVERA, ET AL. VS ELIZABETH GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 MARITZA E OLVERA, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ELIZABETH GONZALEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0656

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLVERA MARITZA E.

RODRIGUEZ IVAN

Defendants

GONZALEZ ELIZABETH

POCASANGRE LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/22/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/22/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT]

8/31/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Summons on Complaint]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jayden Leon (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Gonzalez (Defendant); Luis Pocasangre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jayden Leon (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Gonzalez (Defendant); Luis Pocasangre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Jayden Leon (Plaintiff),Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff),Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff),Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jayden Leon (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Gonzalez (Defendant); Luis Pocasangre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff),Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff),Jayden Leon (Plaintiff),Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jayden Leon (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Gonzalez (Defendant); Luis Pocasangre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maritza E. Olvera (Plaintiff); Ivan Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jayden Leon (Plaintiff); Jeremiah Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Elizabeth Gonzalez (Defendant); Luis Pocasangre (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS