This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 18:46:13 (UTC).

MARISOL LEON VS THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR SERVICE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 MARISOL LEON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR SERVICE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1130

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEON MARISOL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR SERVICE COMPANY

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION

INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS INC.

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR SERVICE CORPORATION

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION DOE 1

INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS INC. DOE 51

Cross Defendants

ROSE 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

Not Classified By Court

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PEREZ FRANK

PEREZ FRANK J ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUEGGEMANN MARK BERNHARD

OTIS CASEY

OLSEN CHRISTOPHER TED ESQ.

ZUCKER LAWRENCE SI II ESQ.

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

TANG NATHALIE

TANG NATHALIE ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANT INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. (Doe 51) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marisol Leon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANG NATHALIE