This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2019 at 02:26:28 (UTC).

MARISOL DELGADO ORDUNO ET AL VS MARIA TESORA LLAGAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 MARISOL DELGADO ORDUNO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA TESORA LLAGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0284

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORDUNO MARISOL DELGADO

Defendants and Respondents

ERFE EDWIN

LLAGAN MARIA TESORA

DOES 1 TO 50

Minors

VERA DAMIAN

ESTRAD HAZZEL

ESTRADA HENNESSY

Guardian Ad Litem

ORDUNO MARISOL DELGADO AND INDIVIDUALLY

Not Classified By Court

ORODUNO MARISOL DELGADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorney

YAGHOUBZADEH JOSHUA E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TRAFTON ALAN PAUL

Minor Attorney

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL IME IN CALIFORNIA)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL IME IN CALIFORNIA)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Request for Refund / Order

5/16/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/10/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

8/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice of Ruling

10/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

Separate Statement

11/18/2019: Separate Statement

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARISOL DELGADO ORDUNO TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN CALIFORNIA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

12/11/2019: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARISOL DELGADO ORDUNO TO SUBMIT TO AN INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN CALIFORNIA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL IME IN CALIFORNIA) OF 12/18/2019

12/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL IME IN CALIFORNIA) OF 12/18/2019

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer

1/10/2019: Answer

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, FSC (And Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

2/9/2019: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial, FSC (And Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/3/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

4/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

4/25/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL - EX PARTE

SUMMONS -

6/8/2018: SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

10/19/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • Hearing10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Hearing03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel IME in California)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel IME in California) of 12/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketObjection (To Declaration of Sevan I. Movsesian In Support of Plaintiff;s Opposition to MOtion to Compel Plaintiff Marisol Delgado Orduno to Submit to an Independent Medical Examination in California and Request for Monitary Sanctions); Filed by EDWIN ERFE (Defendant); MARIA TESORA LLAGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketReply (To Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Plaintiff Marisol Delgado Orduno to Submit to an Independent Medical Examination in California and Request for Monetary Sanctions); Filed by EDWIN ERFE (Defendant); MARIA TESORA LLAGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Marisol Delgado Orduno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion to Compel DME in California); Filed by Marisol Delgado Orduno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Marisol Delgado Orduno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680284    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

marisol delgado orduno, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

maria tesora llagan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC680284

Hearing Date: December 18, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel medical examination in california

Plaintiff Marisol Delgado Orduno (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Maria Tesora Llagan and Edwin Erfe (“Defendants”) following a motor vehicle collision. Defendant moves to compel Plaintiff to submit to an independent medical examination in Los Angeles, California, which is more than 75 miles from her residence in Las Vegas, Nevada. The Court has no tentative order on this motion. Any party who does not appear at the hearing, either in person or via court call, shall waive their right to be heard and shall submit to any decision the Court makes on this motion.

DATED: December 18, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court