This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 16:12:37 (UTC).

MARISOL ANGELICA CARRILLO VS QUALITY EXPEDITORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 MARISOL ANGELICA CARRILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUALITY EXPEDITORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5684

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO MARISOL ANGELICA

Defendants

ALVARADO JAY DENNIS

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

QUALITY EXPEDITORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOLL JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Hearing03/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marisol Angelica Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marisol Angelica Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marisol Angelica Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant