This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2019 at 00:56:11 (UTC).

MARISELA MONTEJO VS IMPULSE AMBULANCE INC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 MARISELA MONTEJO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IMPULSE AMBULANCE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6620

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MONTEJO MARISELA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

IMPULSE AMBULANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CANNON JUSTIN P. ESQ

 

Court Documents

CoverSheet

3/5/2018: CoverSheet

Complaint

3/5/2018: Complaint

Minute Order

8/19/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

9/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

9/5/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

9/5/2019: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 09/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marisela Montejo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPULSE AMBULANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANNON JUSTIN P.