This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:19:05 (UTC).

MARISCOS CULICHIS CORP ET AL VS ELVIRA HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 MARISCOS CULICHIS CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELVIRA HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0570

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MARISCOS CULICHIS CORP

BELTRAN ANEL

VALENZUELA HECTOR I. MOROYOQUI

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ ELVIRA

GUTIERREZ ARIEL

CARTOMAP SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHER JOSEPH C. II

Defendant Attorney

CASTANEDA SERGIO A.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ STEVE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF ARIEL GUTIERREZ D/B/A CARTOMAP SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: ANSWER OF ARIEL GUTIERREZ D/B/A CARTOMAP SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF ARIEL GUTIERREZ D/B/A CARTOMAP SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/9/2018: ANSWER OF ARIEL GUTIERREZ D/B/A CARTOMAP SERVICES TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CHECK ALERT

3/22/2018: CHECK ALERT

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

4/6/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

12/18/2017: Proof of Service

Unknown

12/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

1/5/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/20/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

MARISCOS CULICHI'S CORP, ANEL BELTRAN, AND HECTOR I. MOROYOQUI VALENZUELA'S ANSWER TO ELVIRA HERNANDEZ' UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/20/2017: MARISCOS CULICHI'S CORP, ANEL BELTRAN, AND HECTOR I. MOROYOQUI VALENZUELA'S ANSWER TO ELVIRA HERNANDEZ' UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

8/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

8/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

8/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL CCP 631(D)(4)

8/30/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL CCP 631(D)(4)

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DAMAGES

8/30/2017: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND DAMAGES

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Ariel Gutierrez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mariscos Culichis Corp (Plaintiff); Anel Beltran (Plaintiff); Hector I. Moroyoqui Valenzuela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mariscos Culichis Corp (Plaintiff); Anel Beltran (Plaintiff); Hector I. Moroyoqui Valenzuela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mariscos Culichis Corp (Plaintiff); Anel Beltran (Plaintiff); Hector I. Moroyoqui Valenzuela (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. FRAUD 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0570    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 48

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT (CCP ; 664.6)

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiffs Mariscos Culichi’s Corp and Hector I. Moroyoqui Valenzuela

RESPONDING PARTY(S): No opposition filed.

PROOF OF SERVICE:



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHER JOSEPH C. II ESQ.