This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 18:54:36 (UTC).

MARISCAL, VANESSA VS MARISCAL, BERNARDO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 MARISCAL, VANESSA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARISCAL, BERNARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HORAN, JAMES E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0523

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HORAN, JAMES E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARISCAL VANESSA

Respondent

MARISCAL BERNARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

EADS PAUL A. ESQ

EADS PAUL ANTHONY

Respondent Attorney

BECKMAN JOEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

4/14/2021: Certificate of Clerk - Emailed to pet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout

Request - Continue Hearing - GRANTED ON 12-31-2020

12/4/2020: Request - Continue Hearing - GRANTED ON 12-31-2020

Notice - Continuance

1/7/2021: Notice - Continuance

Responsive Declaration - to Request for Order

12/23/2020: Responsive Declaration - to Request for Order

Minute Order

12/31/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail

12/4/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Proof of Service - Mail

10/26/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/21/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/23/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Minute Order

9/22/2020: Minute Order

Request - Enter Default FL165

6/15/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Declaration - Separate Property

6/15/2020: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

6/15/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

6/24/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Proof of Service - Mail

5/4/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/30/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Case Assignment

3/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Summons

3/30/2020: Summons

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • Hearing07/26/2021 at 8:45 AM in Department 201 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion (Our Children First ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk (Emailed to pet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:45 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Continuance; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 201, Horan, James E., Presiding; Request for Order - Other - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKMAN JOEL JAMES