This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 01:21:44 (UTC).

MARION LEE VS ROSETTA MCGEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 MARION LEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROSETTA MCGEE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON, WENDY CHANG and BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5371

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

WENDY CHANG

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE MARION

Defendants

REAL PROPERTY MORTGAGE AND INVESTMENTS INC.

CHAPPELL JOHN JR.

MCGEE ROSETTA

CHAPPELL CONSTANCE V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYME DAVID M.

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH EVAN LLEWELLYN

AUSTIN L. BISHOP

OLSON SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

10/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS J. WOLFSEN

9/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS J. WOLFSEN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); CA...)

9/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); CA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); CA...) OF 09/08/2022

9/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); CA...) OF 09/08/2022

Proof of Service by Mail

4/11/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

4/11/2022: Notice of Mandatory Evaluation Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RECEIPT OF MSC STATEMENTS (DEPT...)

4/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE RECEIPT OF MSC STATEMENTS (DEPT...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) IN DEPT. 58)

4/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) IN DEPT. 58)

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

5/23/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION, AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST ROSETTA MCGEE

7/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION, AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST ROSETTA MCGEE

Proof of Service by Mail

7/5/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER ...)

7/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER ...)

Case Management Statement

8/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/3/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/24/2022

3/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REFERRAL TO A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/24/2022

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Rosetta McGee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Marion Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default: Filed By: Constance V. Chappell (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS J. WOLFSEN; Filed by: Rosetta McGee (Defendant); As to: Marion Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); Ca...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); Ca...) of 09/08/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/17/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Marion Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Rosetta McGee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marion Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Marion Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Rosetta McGee (Defendant); John Chappell, Jr. (Defendant); Real Property Mortgage and Investments Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory W. Alarcon in Department 36 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: David M. Syme (Attorney); Marion Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Marion Lee (Plaintiff); Rosetta McGee (Defendant); John Chappell, Jr. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: David M. Syme (Attorney); Marion Lee (Plaintiff); As to: Marion Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: David M. Syme (Attorney); As to: Marion Lee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REAL PROPERTY MORTGAGE AND INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUSTIN L. BISHOP

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH EVAN L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLSON SHAWN