Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 22:36:39 (UTC).

MARIO WILLIAMS, JR VS CONRAD MULLINS

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 MARIO WILLIAMS, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONRAD MULLINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6111

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS MARIO JR

Defendant

MULLINS CONRAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT A.

KAWABATA BLAKE M.

Defendant Attorney

REZNIKOV SITORA

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

12/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Conrad Mullins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mario Williams, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mario Williams, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mario Williams, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mario Williams, JR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAWABATA BLAKE MAKOA