This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:10:35 (UTC).

MARIO SAAVEDRAORTIZ ET AL VS SYLVESTER WILLIS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 MARIO SAAVEDRAORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SYLVESTER WILLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8821

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAAVEDRAORTIZ MARIO

SAAVEDRA ESMERALDA

Defendants

CANADA WARREN

TOBIAS JONES MIKEE ROBERT

WILLIS SYLVESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APPLEGATE DOUGLAS LOREN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

7/18/2017: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

SUMMONS

7/18/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

11/28/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/26/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/26/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Submittal of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Submittal of Def...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mario Saavedraortiz (Plaintiff); Esmeralda Saavedra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8821    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 29

The Court has reviewed the Request for Court Judgment and supporting papers against Defendants, Sylvester Willis, Jones Mikee Robert Tobias, Warren Canada and declines to enter judgment because of the following defects.

In compliance with California Rules of Court R. 3.1800, Plaintiffs must submit declarations or other admissible evidence in support of the judgment requested. Plaintiff, Mario Saavedraortiz, has not submitted medical reports or records documenting his injuries or the medical expenses incurred. The request for future medical expenses totaling $10,000 is not supported by any evidence.

The only document submitted with respect to lost earnings is a wage statement which reflects current earnings only. Documentary evidence is required to establish lost earnings.

Plaintiff claims a loss of $500 for property damage which is not supported by any documentary evidence.

Plaintiff, Mirna Esmeralda Saavedra, has not submitted any evidence of damages.

Plaintiffs are required to submit a proposed judgment and a dismissal of all parties against whom judgment is not sought, including Doe Defendants. California Rules of Court 3.1800.

The Court continues the OSC re Default Judgment to 9/3/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department SS-29. Plaintiffs are ordered to submit evidence in support of the judgment no later than 8/24/20.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer APPLEGATE, DOUGLAS L