This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 04:34:46 (UTC).

MARIO RODRIGUEZ VS LISA STANISLAWSKI

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 MARIO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LISA STANISLAWSKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0453

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RODRIGUEZ MARIO

Defendants and Respondents

STANISLAWSKI LISA

DOES 1 TO 60

WBT GROUP LLC - DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GILL JASMINDER ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

VALLEJO RAQUEL ESQ.

DE SPELDER ROBERT B.

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOE 1

7/20/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOE 1

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOT OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

8/15/2018: NOT OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROCIATORIES, SET NO. ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROCIATORIES, SET NO. ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT AND ITS COUNSEL

Answer

8/27/2018: Answer

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONEAND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONEAND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE OFF CALENDAR

10/3/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/15/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Answer

5/25/2018: Answer

Other -

5/25/2018: Other -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/2/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

4/2/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

SUMMONS

4/2/2018: SUMMONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Lisa Stanislawski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice (taking plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to special interrogatories, set no. 1 off calendar); Filed by Mario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPOSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONEAND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Mario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Mario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Answer; Filed by WBT GROUP, LLC - (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • NOT OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Mario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Mario Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700453    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIO RODRIGUEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LISA STANISLAWSKI, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC700453

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 5, 2020

Plaintiff, Mario Rodriguez filed this action against Defendant, Lisa Stanislawski for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed the action on 4/02/18.  On 7/20/18, Plaintiff filed a doe amendment naming WBT Group, LLC as Doe 1 in the action. 

At this time, Plaintiff moves for leave to amend the complaint.  Specifically, he seeks an order permitting him to add a claim for premises liability against East West Bank, contending the accident occurred in part due to the defective design of the Bank’s premises.

Defendant, WBT Group filed an opposition to the motion, wherein it does not take issue with the new claim against East West Bank, but does oppose Plaintiff’s additional of a “negligent training, hiring, and retention” cause of action inserted into the FAC against it.  Notably, the moving papers did not meaningfully address this new cause of action; in reply, Plaintiff indicates he is willing to strike the subject cause of action from the FAC. 

The motion for leave to amend is granted.  Plaintiff is ordered to file a copy of the First Amended Complaint, with the cause of action for negligent hiring, training, and retention stricken (the cause of action should not physically appear in the FAC, which should be edited prior to filing), within ten days.  

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.