This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 15:59:53 (UTC).

MARIO RIVERA VS LLOYD AUSTIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 MARIO RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LLOYD AUSTIN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6055

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA MARIO

Defendants

AUSTIN LLOYD

HARRIS DALONNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HESAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/15/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/15/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/15/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2024
  • Hearing04/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mario Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Lloyd Austin (Defendant); Dalonna Harris (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mario Rivera (Plaintiff); As to: Lloyd Austin (Defendant); Dalonna Harris (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAZDANPANAH HESAM DEAN