This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 03:09:49 (UTC).

MARIO LEGUIZAMO VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 MARIO LEGUIZAMO filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0498

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEGUIZAMO MARIO

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

TAKAHASHI BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

2/21/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/21/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/10/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department O - Hon. Christian R. Gulloneffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 30.00; Service Date: 03/09/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIO LEGUIZAMO (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less