This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 05:05:10 (UTC).

MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON VS LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0082

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BARRON MARIO ESTEBAN

Respondents and Defendants

CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORP

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC

STAFF PRO INC

PAVILLON PARTNERS GP

DOES 1 TO 100

EXECUTIVE EVENT SERVICES LLC DOE1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GIRARDI | KEESE

KEESE GIRARDI |

REKTE ANDRE

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

HEWITT STEPHEN L. ESQ.

LOWARY MARK E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. FOR DAMAGES 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

10/17/2017: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. FOR DAMAGES 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

SUMMONS

10/17/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

11/30/2017: Unknown

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY AND COURT REPORTER AT TRIAL

11/30/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, LIVE NATION WORLDWIDE, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY AND COURT REPORTER AT TRIAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/19/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/29/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT

6/5/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT

Unknown

6/5/2018: Unknown

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/5/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/4/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL,FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]); Filed by Executive Event Services LLC doe1 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES BY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Executive Event Services LLC doe1 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Executive Event Services LLC doe1 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Executive Event Services LLC doe1 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. FOR DAMAGES 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0082    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON,

Plaintiff,

v.

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0082

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE STEPHANIE BOWICK presiding in DEPT. 19 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 13, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****0082    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIO ESTEBAN BARRON,

Plaintiff,

v.

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****0082

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE STEPHANIE BOWICK presiding in DEPT. 19 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 13, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Executive Event Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEWITT STEPHEN