This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:03:32 (UTC).

MARIO DEL ROSARIO CHAVARIN VS PACIFIC PETROLEUM DS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 MARIO DEL ROSARIO CHAVARIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC PETROLEUM DS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2365

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVARIN MARIO DEL ROSARIO

Defendants

PACIFIC PETROLEUM DS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PACIFIC PETROLEUM DS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ARCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

Defendant Attorney

SETTLES STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/3/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/3/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/19/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/30/2022; Service Cost: 62.77; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/02/2022; Service Cost: 58.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mario del Rosario Chavarin (Plaintiff); As to: Pacific Petroleum DS Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SETTLES STEVEN J.