This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2020 at 09:30:37 (UTC).

MARIO COLON VS ALPHA PRINTING & PROMOTION ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 MARIO COLON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALPHA PRINTING PROMOTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7300

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COLON MARIO

Defendants and Respondents

YOON TONY

YANG ANDY

DOES 1 TO 20

YANG JUNG YUL

SONG KI PYUNG

ALPHA PRINTING & PROMOTION

YOON ILL BAE

SONG KI PYUNG AKA TONY YOON

YANG JUNG YUL AKA ANDY YANG

YOON ILL BAE AKA TONY YOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIRMABEKIAN SAKO ESQ.

SIRMABEKIAN SARKIS ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KIM HAEWON

 

Court Documents

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

10/18/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT

Request for Dismissal

12/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

8/14/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling

8/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT ALPHA PRINTING & PROMOTIONS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON...)

8/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT ALPHA PRINTING & PROMOTIONS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF DEFENDANTS ILL BAE YOON AND JUNG YUL YANG (COA 11, 12, 13)

6/11/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF DEFENDANTS ILL BAE YOON AND JUNG YUL YANG (COA 11, 12, 13)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF DEFENDANT ALPHA PRINTING AND PROMOTION (COA 14, 15); DECLARATION OF SARKIS SIRMABEKIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/11/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OF DEFENDANT ALPHA PRINTING AND PROMOTION (COA 14, 15); DECLARATION OF SARKIS SIRMABEKIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) OF 06/24/2019

6/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) OF 06/24/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

3/11/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

3/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Joinder to Motion - Joinder to Motion Yoon and Yang's joinder with motion for judgment on the pleadings of Alpha printing

2/11/2019: Joinder to Motion - Joinder to Motion Yoon and Yang's joinder with motion for judgment on the pleadings of Alpha printing

Declaration - Declaration of Haewon Kim re: Attempts to Meet and Confer Prior to Filing Notice of Motion for the Judgment on the Pleadings

2/11/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Haewon Kim re: Attempts to Meet and Confer Prior to Filing Notice of Motion for the Judgment on the Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

2/11/2019: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Substitution of Attorney -

10/4/2018: Substitution of Attorney -

Case Management Statement -

10/5/2018: Case Management Statement -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. CODE 1197); ETC

5/24/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. CODE 1197); ETC

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mario Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Order (MOTION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order MOTION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by Mario Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Mario Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order (COURT APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT); Filed by Mario Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. CODE 1197); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mario Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707300    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 19

Plaintiff Mario Colon's Unopposed Motion For Court Approval of PAGA Settlement is GRANTED. (Labor Code section 2699(l).)

Order signed this date.

Counsel for Plaintiff to give notice.