This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2019 at 02:40:23 (UTC).

MARIO CESAR PURIZACA VS RAUL RODRIGUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 MARIO CESAR PURIZACA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAUL RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6604

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PURIZACA MARIO CESAR

Respondents and Defendants

SOUTH GATE CITY OF

RODRIGUEZ RAUL

DOES 1 TO 25

CITY OF SOUTH GATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y. ESQ.

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

SALINAS RAUL F. ESQ.

SALINAS RAUL FRANCISCO

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

9/19/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

SUMMONS -

9/19/2017: SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT RAUL RODRIGUEZ

5/1/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT RAUL RODRIGUEZ

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH GATE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/21/2018: DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH GATE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Proposed Order and stipulation to continue Trial

1/31/2019: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Proposed Order and stipulation to continue Trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/28/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

8/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Notice of Settlement

8/27/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/27/2019

8/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 08/27/2019

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIO CESAR PURIZACA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;) of 08/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MARIO CESAR PURIZACA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of South Gate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RAUL RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH GATE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of South Gate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MARIO CESAR PURIZACA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MARIO CESAR PURIZACA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIO CESAR PURIZACA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH GATE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SOUTH GATE A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS RAUL F. ESQ.