This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 14:50:23 (UTC).

MARIO ABERNATHY VS ALLISON ELIZABETH BRUNELL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 MARIO ABERNATHY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ALLISON ELIZABETH BRUNELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8478

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABERNATHY MARIO

Defendants

BRUNELL ALLISON ELIZABETH

BRUNELL MARIA ANNA

BRUNELL KENNETH DAVID

CASCIO VINCE

KIMMEL STEVEN L.

CASCIO DOE 2 VINCE

KIMMEL DOE 1 STEVEN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

10/5/2021: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 10/06/2021

10/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE) OF 10/06/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Case Management Statement

7/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

6/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

5/19/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

5/19/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

5/20/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; CASE MANA...)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; CASE MANA...)

Case Management Statement

4/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 3:38 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related Case) of 10/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Allison Elizabeth Brunell (Defendant); Kenneth David Brunell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Does 21 - 100, inclusive,) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Allison Elizabeth Brunell (Defendant); Kenneth David Brunell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mario Abernathy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mario Abernathy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mario Abernathy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN