Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:01:40 (UTC).

MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC VS TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS INC

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6478

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC

Defendants and Respondents

TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS INC

DOES 1 TO 10

MARYLAND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DIAZ KRISTINA M.

JAVAHERI MICHAEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NEWMAN PAUL ANDREW

CRISLER TED R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

3/1/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF TED R. CRISLER IN SUPPORT OF JOINT LX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

7/10/2018: DECLARATION OF TED R. CRISLER IN SUPPORT OF JOINT LX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

7/10/2018: JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

DECLARATION OF COURTNEY E. VAUDREUTH IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

7/10/2018: DECLARATION OF COURTNEY E. VAUDREUTH IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Minute Order

7/10/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; MAILING ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; MAILING ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER

Notice of Settlement

10/9/2018: Notice of Settlement

Unknown

10/23/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/23/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

11/27/2018: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

12/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/11/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/11/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/21/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS

9/19/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

9/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS INC (Defendant); MARYLAND TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM INC (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Answer; Filed by TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEMS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MARINER AVE PROPERTY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Telecommunication Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWMAN PAUL ANDREW