This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 12:14:10 (UTC).

MARINA QUINTERO VS ARNIE MORTONS OF CHICAGO FIGUEROA LLC ET

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 MARINA QUINTERO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ARNIE MORTONS OF CHICAGO FIGUEROA LLC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3211

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

QUINTERO MARINA

QUINTERO MARINA AN INDIVIDUAL ON BEHAL

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

ARNIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO/FIGUEROA LLC

ARNIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO

PORTERHOUSE OF LOS ANGELES INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE

ARNIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO A CORP.

STEAKHOUSE MORTON'S THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KOUL LAW FIRM

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO

FIRM KOUL LAW

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MCCORTNEY RYAN D. ESQ.

MCCORTNEY RYAN DOUGLAS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

4/16/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/19/2021

4/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/19/2021

Case Management Statement

11/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL) OF 01/04/2021

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL) OF 01/04/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/15/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

6/24/2019: Notice of Related Case

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/26/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Case Management Statement

5/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

9/14/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (of 8-10 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:14 PM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of 04/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Marina Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (of 8-10 days) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:34 AM in Department A, Huey P. Cotton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marina Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marina Quintero (Plaintiff); Marina Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: CIVIL PENALTIES FOR VIOLATION OF THE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004, CAL. LABOR CODE 2699 ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marina Quintero (Plaintiff); Marina Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARNIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO/FIGUEROA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON