This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 10:53:31 (UTC).

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES VS AFSHIN BABAZADEH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against AFSHIN BABAZADEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES

Defendants

BABAZADEH AFSHIN

ENAYATI HERTSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/13/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/13/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Application for Order to Post

1/25/2022: Application for Order to Post

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

3/8/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint

12/29/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

12/29/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

12/29/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AFSHIN BABAZADEH)

12/30/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (AFSHIN BABAZADEH)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HERTSEL ENAYATI)

12/30/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (HERTSEL ENAYATI)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/30/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Afshin Babazadeh)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Hertsel Enayati)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Unlawful Detainer (UD); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS