This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 20:53:59 (UTC).

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES VS AARON WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against AARON WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1666

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES

Defendant

WILLIAMS AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

2/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

2/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

1/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Notice of Continuance

2/1/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

2/1/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

1/25/2022: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

11/17/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Exhibit List

1/21/2022: Exhibit List

Witness List

1/21/2022: Witness List

Answer

10/25/2021: Answer

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

12/21/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

11/29/2021: Unknown - NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)]

11/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ONLINE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ODR) UNLAWFUL DETAINER (UD)]

Answer

10/25/2021: Answer

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance); Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aaron Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Aaron Williams)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS