This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2020 at 11:33:03 (UTC).

MARINA D. HERNANDEZ VS PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL, INC. (A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 MARINA D HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4308

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ MARINA D. AKA MARINA DEL CARMEN HERNANDEZ DUARTE AN INDIVIDUAL

HERNANDEZ MARINA D.

Defendants

AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS INC. A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

Defendant Attorney

TURNER ANNE M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Order

6/25/2020: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

6/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/25/2020

6/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/25/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Case Management Statement

4/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Answer - ANSWER OF AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/27/2020: Answer - ANSWER OF AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/14/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/21/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/25/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Furniture Rentals, Inc. (a Pennsylvania corporation) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:38 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marina D. Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less