This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 00:35:56 (UTC).

MARILYN GORDON VS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 MARILYN GORDON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5837

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON MARILYN

Defendants

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

AVANTI HOSPITALS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNES CARL D.

Defendant Attorney

GASPARIAN CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

1/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL

1/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CARMEN VIGIL

Answer

1/11/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/9/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/28/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Memorial Hospital of Gardena (Defendant); Avanti Hospitals, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marilyn Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Memorial Hospital of Gardena (Defendant); Avanti Hospitals, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Memorial Hospital of Gardena (Defendant); Avanti Hospitals, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Carmen Vigil); Filed by Memorial Hospital of Gardena (Defendant); Avanti Hospitals, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Memorial Hospital of Gardena (Defendant); Avanti Hospitals, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Marilyn Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marilyn Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marilyn Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marilyn Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVANTI HOSPITALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASPARIAN CHRISTINA