Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 16:34:56 (UTC).

MARILINA ROBLES VS RIVERA SANATARIUM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 MARILINA ROBLES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RIVERA SANATARIUM, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7179

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBLES MARILINA

Defendant

RIVERA SANATARIUM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA COLONIAL GARDENS NURSING HOME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorney

HOUSE CALVIN

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/17/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/6/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/7/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RIVERA SANATARIUM, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marilina Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marilina Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marilina Robles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERA SANATARIUM INC DBA COLONIAL GARDENS NURSING HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUSE CALVIN R. ESQ.