This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 10:53:51 (UTC).

MARIETTA CASTILLO VS EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 MARIETTA CASTILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES SERVICES FOR SENIORS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1051

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO MARIETTA

Defendants

ECS MANAGEMENT LLC

EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS

THE CANTEBURY AN EPISCOPAL HOME COMMUNITY

THE CANTEBURY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACEVES VIRIDIANA EDITH

Defendant Attorney

PRIAGULA CITADELLE B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/22/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/22/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order - COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/4/2023: Order - COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BARBARA JAMES, CSR # 7009

5/4/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE BARBARA JAMES, CSR # 7009

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC, FSC, TRIAL

5/15/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC, FSC, TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION RE MTC RFP

5/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE MTC RFP

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/15/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/15/2023: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/15/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/15/2023: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/15/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/15/2023: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST F...)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST F...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/8/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/8/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2025
  • Hearing05/05/2025 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2025
  • Hearing04/25/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2023
  • Hearing12/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default of Deft. The Cantebury Retirement Community

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default of Deft. The Cantebury, an Episcopal Home Community

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Marietta Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: ECS MANAGEMENT LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 07/06/2022; Service Cost: 194.18; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mel Red Recana in Department 45 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marietta Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY, AN EPISCOPAL HOME COMMUNITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marietta Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY, AN EPISCOPAL HOME COMMUNITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marietta Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY, AN EPISCOPAL HOME COMMUNITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marietta Castillo (Plaintiff); As to: EPISCOPAL COMMUNITIES & SERVICES FOR SENIORS (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY (Defendant); THE CANTEBURY, AN EPISCOPAL HOME COMMUNITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less