This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2023 at 00:47:44 (UTC).

MARIELA ESCOBEDO VS BERNARDS BROS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 MARIELA ESCOBEDO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BERNARDS BROS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1828

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCOBEDO MARIELA

Defendant

BERNARDS BROS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FINNERTY JOSEPH ROBERT

KASRELIOVICH BORISLAV

TREYZON BORIS

Defendant Attorney

SMITH KEITH E

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SUTHERLAND JAMES B

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

1/9/2023: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/09/2023

1/9/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 01/09/2023

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

1/3/2023: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SURVEILLANCE VIDEO OR PHOTOGRAPHS

12/27/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF SURVEILLANCE VIDEO OR PHOTOGRAPHS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALTERNATIVE CAUSE

12/27/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALTERNATIVE CAUSE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REIMBURSEMENT RATES TO DISCOUNT PLAINTIFFS FUTURE MEDICAL EXPENSES

12/27/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF REIMBURSEMENT RATES TO DISCOUNT PLAINTIFFS FUTURE MEDICAL EXPENSES

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE NON-PARTY WITNESSES AND EXPERTS FROM THE COURTROOM DURING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE NON-PARTY WITNESSES AND EXPERTS FROM THE COURTROOM DURING TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES IN EXCESS OF AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID AND INCURRED; MEMORA

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES IN EXCESS OF AMOUNTS ACTUALLY PAID AND INCURRED; MEMORA

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO, MENTION, OR EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY INSURANCE COVERAGE A

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO, MENTION, OR EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY INSURANCE COVERAGE A

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS NOT DISCLOSED DURING THEIR DEPOSITIO

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY BY PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS NOT DISCLOSED DURING THEIR DEPOSITIO

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

12/21/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 FOR AN ORDER TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE OF SPECIFIC DOLLAR VERDICT AMOUNTS IN VOIR DIRE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 FOR AN ORDER TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE OF SPECIFIC DOLLAR VERDICT AMOUNTS IN VOIR DIRE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF'S TREATING PHYSICIANS OR WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED DURING DIS

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF'S TREATING PHYSICIANS OR WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED DURING DIS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE PHOTOGRAPHS OF THE ALLEGED SCENE OF THE INCIDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF KEITH E. SMITH IN SUPPOR

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 TO EXCLUDE PHOTOGRAPHS OF THE ALLEGED SCENE OF THE INCIDENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF KEITH E. SMITH IN SUPPOR

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF KEITH E. SMITH IN S

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND WITNESSES NOT DISCLOSED DURING DISCOVERY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF KEITH E. SMITH IN S

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO FINANCIAL CONDITION, SIZE AND RESOURCES OF DEFENDANT AT TRIAL; MEMORAN

12/22/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO FINANCIAL CONDITION, SIZE AND RESOURCES OF DEFENDANT AT TRIAL; MEMORAN

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MARIELA ESCOBEDO on 03/24/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by MARIELA ESCOBEDO as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDS BROS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 01/09/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDS BROS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDS BROS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDS BROS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIELA ESCOBEDO (Plaintiff); As to: BERNARDS BROS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1828 Hearing Date: September 26, 2022 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIELA ESCOBEDO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BERNARDS BROS., INC.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: *******1828

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT BERNARD BROS., INC.’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

September, 2022

On August 31, 2022, Defendant Bernard Bros., Inc. (“Defendant”) filed this motion to continue the trial date to February 9, 2023. At the time the motion was filed, trial was scheduled for October 6, 2022.

On September 20, 2022, the Court granted an ex parte application to continue trial and all pre-trial related deadlines. Trial was continued to February 6, 2023 and the final status conference was scheduled for January 23, 2023, with all discovery and motion cutoff deadlines to be based on the stipulation between the parties included in the ex parte application.

In light of this recent ruling, Defendant’s motion to continue trial is DENIED as moot.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue. If the Court does not receive emails from the parties indicating submission on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may, at its discretion, adopt the tentative as the final order or place the motion off calendar.