This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 06:35:42 (UTC).

MARIE NASHOLD VS JEFF VERDICK ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 MARIE NASHOLD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFF VERDICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6646

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NASHOLD MARIE

Defendants and Respondents

BEACON PICTURES

TEAMSTERS LOCAL #399

VERDICK JEFF

ENTERTAINMENT PARTNERS

FOX STUDIOS

DOES 1 TO 50

FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INCORPORATION

FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS PRODUCTIONS

TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS INC.

TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS INC. DOE1

TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LADERMAN GERALD L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RICK L. PETERSON

PETERSON RICK L

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/7/2018: Unknown

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF SARITA PATEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: DECLARATION OF SARITA PATEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION DAVID VIGILANTE IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: DECLARATION DAVID VIGILANTE IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK, TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS, INC, TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS, INC., BEACON FILMS, LLC, AND TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMAR

4/4/2018: DEFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK, TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS, INC, TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS, INC., BEACON FILMS, LLC, AND TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMAR

DECLARATION OF SUZANN ELLIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: DECLARATION OF SUZANN ELLIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ROBERT REMMEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: DECLARATION OF ROBERT REMMEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY FINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/4/2018: DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY FINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS OF GERALD LADERMAN AND PATTI MCCLURE;

4/11/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATIONS OF GERALD LADERMAN AND PATTI MCCLURE;

Minute Order

4/11/2018: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

4/11/2018: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

DEFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK, TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS, INC., TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS, INC.

4/24/2018: DEFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK, TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS, INC., TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS, INC.

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/3/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS INC.;AND ETC.

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DFENDANTS JEFF VERDICK TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS INC.;AND ETC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/11/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION DAVID WOLKIS IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/11/2018: DECLARATION DAVID WOLKIS IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF SUZANN ELLIS IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/11/2018: DECLARATION OF SUZANN ELLIS IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY FINE IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEMT

6/11/2018: DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY FINE IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEMT

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Marie Nashold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Jeff Verdick (Defendant); TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sarita Patel in support of motion for summary judgment); Filed by Jeff Verdick (Defendant); TURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS INC. DOE1 (Defendant); TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketTURNER ORIGINAL PRODUCTIONS, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF MARIE NASHOLD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marie Nashold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Marie Nashold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Marie Nashold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marie Nashold (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TURNER NORTH CENTER PRODUCTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TEAMSTERS LOCAL UNION 683 is a litigant

Latest cases where TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION is a litigant