This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 13:15:40 (UTC).

MARIE AGUERO VS UNITED BUILDING COMPANY, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 MARIE AGUERO filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against UNITED BUILDING COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5464

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUERO MARIE

Defendants

88TH & VERMONT MGP LLC

UNITED BUILDING COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBALEVICH DANIEL A.

SOTO ASHLEY G.

FISHENFELD RACHEL

GIBALEVICH DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

LEE JAMES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

12/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/5/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

5/9/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2024
  • Hearing12/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • Hearing06/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UNITED BUILDING COMPANY, INC (Defendant); 88TH & VERMONT MGP, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIE AGUERO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED BUILDING MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOTO ASHLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHENFELD RACHEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBALEVICH DANIEL A. ESQ.