This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 03:37:19 (UTC).

MARICRUZ HINOJOS VS SUONG THI HONG NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 MARICRUZ HINOJOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUONG THI HONG NGUYEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7554

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HINOJOS MARICRUZ

Defendant

NGUYEN SUONG THI HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/20/2021

4/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/20/2021

Order - Dismissal

4/20/2021: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

PI General Order

11/15/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/22/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

10/22/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 04/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maricruz Hinojos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maricruz Hinojos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maricruz Hinojos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA