This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 06:18:38 (UTC).

MARICELA OJEDA, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 MARICELA OJEDA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3015

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OJEDA MARICELA

OJEDA SALOMON

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY DAVID NEAL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maricela Ojeda (Plaintiff); Salomon Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maricela Ojeda (Plaintiff); Salomon Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maricela Ojeda (Plaintiff); Salomon Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maricela Ojeda (Plaintiff); Salomon Ojeda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY DAVID N.