This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 05:20:16 (UTC).

MARICELA HERNANDEZ VS VICTORIA A SCALA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 MARICELA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VICTORIA A SCALA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5402

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ MARICELA

Defendants and Respondents

SCALA CHRISTINA

SCALA ROSEMARY

SCALA VICTORIA A.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JANFAZA RON A. ROSEN ESQ.

JANFAZA RON A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY BETH LOUISE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

General Denial

10/11/2018: General Denial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/11/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/11/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

10/19/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

10/19/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice

11/9/2018: Notice

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/13/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

6/16/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by Victoria A. Scala (Defendant); Rosemary Scala (Defendant); Christina Scala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Notice (of New Trial Dates); Filed by Victoria A. Scala (Defendant); Rosemary Scala (Defendant); Christina Scala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time or in the Alternative an Order to Continue the Trial Date); Filed by Victoria A. Scala (Defendant); Rosemary Scala (Defendant); Christina Scala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Victoria A. Scala (Defendant); Rosemary Scala (Defendant); Christina Scala (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maricela Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maricela Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maricela Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Maricela Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC665402    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

maricela hernandez,

Plaintiff,

v.

victoria a. scala, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC665402

Hearing Date: November 12, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel discovery responses

Defendants Victoria A. Scala, Rosemary Scala, and Christina Scala (“Defendants”) move to compel responses from Plaintiff Maricela Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) to Special Interrogatories, Set Two (“SROG”). The motion is granted.

Defendants served the SROG on Plaintiff on July 12, 2019 by mail. Defendants granted Plaintiff multiple extensions of time to respond to September 9, 2019. As of the filing date of this motion, Defendants have not received responses from Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not opposed the motion, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Plaintiff has complied with her discovery obligations. Therefore, the motion to compel responses to the SROG is granted per Code of Civil Procedure section 2030.290. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to Defendants’ SROG, without objections, within thirty (30) days of service of this order.

Defendants seek sanctions in connection with the motions.  The Court concludes that Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process.  The Court awards sanctions against Plaintiff and her counsel of record, Ron A. Rosen Janfaza, in the amount of $572, which represents four hours of attorney time at $133 per hour, plus the $40 Defendants requested for part of the filing fee.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendants’ motion to compel responses to the SROG is granted per Code of Civil Procedure section 2030.290. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff and her counsel of record, Ron A. Rosen Janfaza, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $572 to Defendants, by and through counsel, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Defendants are ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: November 12, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court