This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 06:15:22 (UTC).

MARICELA ALONSO ET AL VS 99 CENTS ONLY STORES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 MARICELA ALONSO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, PATRICIA D. NIETO, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4206

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

PATRICIA D. NIETO

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JASSO JONATHAN

ALONSO MARICELA

Respondents and Defendants

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

99 CENTS ONLY STORES

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

DOLAN MICHAEL A. JR. ESQ.

DOLAN MICHAEL ANTHONY JR ESQ.

DOLAN MICHAEL A. JR ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL NO...) OF 11/08/2021

11/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL NO...) OF 11/08/2021

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL NO...)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) CONDITIONAL NO...)

Order - Dismissal

11/8/2021: Order - Dismissal

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

10/6/2021: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Notice of Ruling

7/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/15/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARICELA ALONSO'S PET...)

7/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARICELA ALONSO'S PET...)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT JONATHAN JASON (AGE 6)

7/15/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT JONATHAN JASON (AGE 6)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

6/23/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE PETITIONER ...)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE PETITIONER ...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

5/14/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

5/14/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...) OF 05/07/2021

5/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...) OF 05/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON PETITIONER / GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARICELA ALONSO'...)

Notice of Ruling

5/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

4/23/2021: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Conditional Notice Filed 12/01/2020) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Compliance - Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional No...) of 11/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional No...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff); Jonathan Jasso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise (- Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem Maricela Alonso's Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Dispositon of Proceeds of Judgment as to Minor ClaimantJonathan Jasso (Age 6)) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem Maricela Alonso's Pet...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
184 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOpposition to Defendant's Demurrer and Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff); Jonathan Jasso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketDEMURRER OF DEFENDANT 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC; MEMORANDUM OR POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT [CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 435, 436]; MEMORANDUM OR POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff); Jonathan Jasso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maricela Alonso (Plaintiff); Jonathan Jasso (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: ****4206 Hearing Date: July 15, 2021 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

The Court excuses the personal appearance of the claimant and the guardian ad litem. Counsel may appear by telephone or video conference call.

The Court has reviewed the Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor. The Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petition.

The Court has considered the Declaration of Vartkes Artinian in support of the fee request. The Court finds that on the current record, and in consideration of the factors set forth in Cal Rules of Court, Rule 7.955(b), a fee of 25% of the gross settlement is reasonable.

The Court approves the following distribution of the settlement proceeds:

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$6250.00

Medical expenses (None)

$0.00

Costs (None)

$0.00

Total fees and costs

$0.00

Total Settlement

$25,000.00

Less credits

$6250.00

Net Settlement into blocked account

$18,750.00

The total funds of $18,750 is to be deposited in a blocked account associated with Bank of America, which is permitted by L.A. County Super. Ct. R 4.115(b)(2).

An Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account is set for 11/08/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of the Entire Action currently set for 11/08/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse, remains on calendar as currently set.

If proof of deposit and Request for Dismissal are filed and entered, no appearance is necessary.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

'


Case Number: ****4206    Hearing Date: March 29, 2021    Dept: 29

Alonso, et. al.  vs.  9 Cents Only Stores

Court Order Re: Continuance of the April 2, 2021 Hearing on Petition and the 04/07/2020 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal to April 29, 2021;

On the Court's own motion,  Hearing on  Petitioner / Guardian ad Litem, Maricela Alonso's Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment as to Minor Claimant: Jonathan Jasso (Age 5), scheduled for 03/29/2021, and the Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) Conditional Notice Filed 12/01/2020 scheduled for 04/07/2021,  are continued to 04/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Counsel for the Moving Party(ies) is ordered to give notice and file proof of service of said notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 CENTS ONLY STORES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOULLA DANIEL D