This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 14:56:13 (UTC).

MARICANDY MARTINEZ VS CASA MIA CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 MARICANDY MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CASA MIA CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5170

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MARICANDY

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

6928-32 WOODLEY LLC

ALL ABOUT LANDSCAPE INC. DBA IT IS ALL ABOUT GARDENING

CASA MIA CONSTRUCTION INC.

MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACOSTA MARIELYS CAROLYN

Defendant Attorneys

CHELSEA SUSAN KAY

O'CONNOR EDWARD RICHARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

9/23/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/23/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/3/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/9/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PI General Order

7/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • Hearing07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Hearing01/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Hearing12/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 6928-32 Woodley, LLC (Defendant); MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by 6928-32 Woodley, LLC (Defendant); MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 6928-32 Woodley, LLC (Defendant); MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by 6928-32 Woodley, LLC (Defendant); MBK Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by All About Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by All About Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by All About Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maricandy Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MBK MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACOSTA MARIELYS CAROLYN