This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 16:02:55 (UTC).

MARIANNE HAMADA VS NATIVO, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 MARIANNE HAMADA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NATIVO, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4927

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMADA MARIANNE

Defendants

NATIVO INC.

PESHAK CHAD

CHOI JUSTIN

KIM WOO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS MICHELLE L.

Defendant Attorneys

HASSAN WARSAME Y.

LAMAR KARIMAH JAMILAH-AKILAH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARIMAH J. LAMAR IN SUPPORT OF MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41(A)(2)

1/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KARIMAH J. LAMAR IN SUPPORT OF MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41(A)(2)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

1/15/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice of Appearance

2/23/2021: Notice of Appearance

Status Conference Statement

3/4/2021: Status Conference Statement

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

3/8/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARA ABDULAHI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SARA ABDULAHI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/8/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/8/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

7/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: PLAINTIFF'S GOOD CAUSE FOR NOT FILING OPPOSITION

7/26/2021: Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: PLAINTIFF'S GOOD CAUSE FOR NOT FILING OPPOSITION

Status Conference Statement

7/27/2021: Status Conference Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION AMENDED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE REYNOLDS,

8/12/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION AMENDED DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE REYNOLDS,

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE REYNOLDS, ESQ.

8/12/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MICHELLE REYNOLDS, ESQ.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration, Denying Request to Strike Class Claims, and Denying Request to Dismiss or Stay PAGA Cause of Action); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Further Status Confe...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement; Filed by Marianne Hamada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketReply (in support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, Strike Class Allegations, and Stay Proceedings); Filed by Nativo, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Choi (Defendant); Woo Kim (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by Nativo, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Choi (Defendant); Woo Kim (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 4:13 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Initial Status Conference Order]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marianne Hamada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marianne Hamada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marianne Hamada (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Warsame Yusuf Hassan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMAR KARIMAH JAMILAH-AKILAH