This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 18:18:25 (UTC).

MARIANNA FRENZEL VS RACHEL KRONIK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 MARIANNA FRENZEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RACHEL KRONIK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5657

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRENZEL MARIANNA

Defendants

KRONIK RACHEL

ROTHBART HALEY

ROTHBART JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDVER ALINA

Defendant Attorney

LEATON STACEY D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/16/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

2/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/24/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

PI General Order

3/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/13/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES, THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION OF NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES ATTACHMENT FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES, THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION OF NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES ATTACHMENT FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES, THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION OF NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, AND EXEMPLARY DAMAGES ATTACHMENT FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND ORDER; Filed by Rachel Kronik (Defendant); Haley Rothbart (Defendant); James Rothbart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rachel Kronik (Defendant); Haley Rothbart (Defendant); James Rothbart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Marianna Frenzel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEATON STACEY D.