Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 08:26:43 (UTC).

MARIANA C. AMESPIL VS THEODORE KIRKLAND

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 MARIANA C AMESPIL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THEODORE KIRKLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4616

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMESPIL MARIANA C.

Defendant

KIRKLAND THEODORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAPETTO LIONEL

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

3/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/8/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/16/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/20/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/20/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Theodore Kirkland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Theodore Kirkland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Theodore Kirkland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mariana C. Amespil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lionel Sapetto (Attorney); Mariana C. Amespil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mariana C. Amespil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mariana C. Amespil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.