This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:45:22 (UTC).

MARIAM DEBORAH PAL VS JANA TOWNSLEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 MARIAM DEBORAH PAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JANA TOWNSLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3767

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAL MARIAM DEBORAH

Respondents and Defendants

TOWNSLEY JANA

GORDON JONATHAN

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD A. MARCUS

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

ATABEK JON A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/6/2018: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order

2/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

3/16/2018: DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S LATE FILED REPLY PAPERS

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S LATE FILED REPLY PAPERS

NOTICE OF RULING RELATING CASES, VACATING HEARINGS, AND NOTICE OF RESETTING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RELATING CASES, VACATING HEARINGS, AND NOTICE OF RESETTING OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S DEMURRER

4/13/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S DEMURRER

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/25/2018: Minute Order

CROSS-COMPLAINANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; JURY DEMAND

5/23/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; JURY DEMAND

DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIAM DEBORAH PAL; JURY DEMAND

5/23/2018: DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIAM DEBORAH PAL; JURY DEMAND

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/13/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/22/2019: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

1/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTERING DEFAULT OF JANA TOWNSLEY AND STRIKING DEMURRER; ETC.

1/26/2018: DEFENDANT JANA TOWNSLEY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTERING DEFAULT OF JANA TOWNSLEY AND STRIKING DEMURRER; ETC.

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES &

1/29/2018: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES &

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 56; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Jana Townsley (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mariam Deborah Pal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Mariam Deborah Pal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mariam Deborah Pal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR IDENTITY THEFT, AND FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3767    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIAM DEBORAH PAL, etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

JANA TOWNSLEY, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: ****3767

ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: December 18, 2019

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept: 56

Plaintiff’s default judgment application is valid in all respects except: (1) Plaintiff did not submit a summary of the case as required by California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(a)(1); (2) Plaintiff did not dismiss all parties against whom judgment is not sought including “Doe” Defendants as required by California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(a)(7); and (3) default has not yet been entered against Defendant Jonathan Gordon.

Plaintiff’s Default Judgment Application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 18th day of December 2019

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court